This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 11:09:56 (UTC).

Velazquez v. CM School Supply, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Velazquez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CM School Supply, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07174

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Velazquez

Defendant

CM School Supply, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Ste 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CM School Supply, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26582080)Document filed by Bryan Velazquez..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/30/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CM School Supply, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Velazquez..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CM School Supply, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CM School Supply, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CM School Supply, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Velazquez..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/30/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Rozenberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (vf) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CM School Supply, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26582080)Document filed by Bryan Velazquez..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Rozenberg