This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2021 at 07:09:47 (UTC).

Velasquez v. Von Design, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2021 Velasquez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Von Design, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04822

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Velasquez

Defendants

Von Design, Ltd. a New York corporation doing business as Von

Bowery Corner Owner LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz

Attorney at The Weitz Law Firm, P.A.

18305 Biscayne Boulevard

Aventura, FL 33160

Defendant Attorneys

Ge Qu

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

Jian Hang

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-18 39Th Avenue Suite 1003

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jian Hang on behalf of Von Design, Ltd...(Hang, Jian) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ge Qu on behalf of Von Design, Ltd...(Qu, Ge) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bowery Corner Owner LLC served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Mirel, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Von Design, Ltd. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Mirel, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bowery Corner Owner LLC. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Von Design, Ltd. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOWERY CORNER OWNER LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VON DESIGN, LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bowery Corner Owner LLC, Von Design, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24635121)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jian Hang on behalf of Von Design, Ltd...(Hang, Jian) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ge Qu on behalf of Von Design, Ltd...(Qu, Ge) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/14/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bowery Corner Owner LLC served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Mirel, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Von Design, Ltd. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Mirel, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bowery Corner Owner LLC. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Von Design, Ltd. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOWERY CORNER OWNER LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VON DESIGN, LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bowery Corner Owner LLC, Von Design, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24635121)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/7/2021. (vf) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ge Qu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jian Hang