This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 10:12:11 (UTC).

Karina Isabel Velasquez v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Karina Isabel Velasquez filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Southwest Airlines Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KATRINA ISABEL VELASQUEZ

Karina Isabel Velasquez

Defendants

Southwest Airlines Co

DOES 1-25, inclusive,

Southwest Airlines Co.

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Antonio Lepera

Attorney at Lepera and Associates PC

601 Montgomery Street Suite 665

San Francisco, CA 94111

Donel Revita Lopez

Attorney at Lepera and Associates, PC

601 Montgomery Street Suite 665

San Francisco, CA 94111

Patrick Anthony Hormillosa

Attorney at Lepera and Associates, PC

601 Montgomery Street Suite 665

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Natasha Mikha Pardasani

Attorney at Victor Rane

9350 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Nicole Ashley Poltash

Attorney at Victor Rane

9350 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Richard A. Lazenby

Attorney at Victor Rane

9350 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 308

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#13

(#13) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 5/9/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference (MSC) set for 2/25/2022 and issues this case management order. The request by Plaintiffs counsel to appear remotely at the MSC is denied as moot. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #10 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/18/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 5/9/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/8/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 7/29/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 8/12/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 8/5/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 10/21/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 11/4/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Joseph A. Lepera Request for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff Karina Isabel Velasquez. (Lepera, Joseph) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#10

(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co... (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on February 25, 2022 before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by February 15, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit C: Plaintiffs Statements of Damages

1 #2

Exhibit B: Southwest's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 5/9/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference (MSC) set for 2/25/2022 and issues this case management order. The request by Plaintiffs counsel to appear remotely at the MSC is denied as moot. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #10 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/18/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 5/9/2022. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/8/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 7/29/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 8/12/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 8/5/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 10/21/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 11/4/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Joseph A. Lepera Request for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff Karina Isabel Velasquez. (Lepera, Joseph) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co... (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on February 25, 2022 before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by February 15, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Southwest Airlines Co. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Karina Isabel Velasquez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/01/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV40063 Receipt No: ACACDC-32626670 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Southwest's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Plaintiffs Statements of Damages) (Attorney Natasha Mikha Pardasani added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:dft))(Pardasani, Natasha) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant