This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:32:49 (UTC).

Velasquez v. Bridge & Tunnel, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Velasquez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Bridge Tunnel, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07610

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Velasquez

Defendants

Bridge & Tunnel, LLC a New York limited liability company doing business as Marshall Stack

Coriad Realty Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz

Attorney at The Weitz Law Firm, P.A.

18305 Biscayne Boulevard

Aventura, FL 33160

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 12/17/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIDGE & TUNNEL, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORIAD REALTY CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridge & Tunnel, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coriad Realty Corp. (vf) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coriad Realty Corp. (vf) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridge & Tunnel, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORIAD REALTY CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIDGE & TUNNEL, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 12/17/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bridge & Tunnel, LLC, Coriad Realty Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25047987)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez..(Weitz, Ben-Zion) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FKA ROSENBERG BAGELS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz