This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 09:01:00 (UTC).

Velasquez v. AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Velasquez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03195

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Velasquez

Defendants

AAA Insurance

CSAA General Insurance Company

AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Micah L. Larson

Attorney at Larson Law Firm

319 Ross Avenue

Alamosa, CO 81101

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Alain Wright

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Diane Velasquez All parties consent.. (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Diane Velasquez. (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Of Micah L. Larson Esq. by Micah L. Larson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Micah L. Larson added to party Diane Velasquez(pty:pla) (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#13

(#18) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #13 Magistrate Judge filed by attorney David Stanford Law. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

1 #34

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #29

Exhibit C-Property record

1 #27

Exhibit A-State Court Order Vacating December 2, 2021 Hearing

1 #24

Exhibit A-State Court Response to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment

1 #22

Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit F to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment

1 #20

Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit D to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment

1 #17

Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit A to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment

1 #16

Exhibit A-State Court Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment

1 #15

Exhibit A-State Court Entry of Appearance

1 #9

Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service

1 #6

Exhibit A-State Court Summons

1 #5

Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE of Service by email by Clerk of Court re 23 Order on Motion to Remand to the to the Conejos County District Court at ConejosClerk@judicial.state.co.us. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. Accordingly, this matter is REMANDED to the Conejos County District Court. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 22 December 2021. Text Only Entry(cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #21 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Diane Velasquez All parties consent.. (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court regarding #19 Unopposed MOTION to Remand. The parties shall jointly file the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction on or before 12/22/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/17/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Diane Velasquez. (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #13 Magistrate Judge filed by attorney David Stanford Law. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #16 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Micah L. Larson. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Of Micah L. Larson Esq. by Micah L. Larson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Micah L. Larson added to party Diane Velasquez(pty:pla) (Larson, Micah) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by AAA Insurance/CSAA General Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATE COURT ORDER - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S Motion to SET ASIDE Default Judgment. Granted by Conejos County District Court Judge Crista Lee Newmyer-Olsen on 11/15/2021. (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER - ORDER of DEFAULT JUDGEMENT by Conejos County District Court Judge on 8/24/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, District Court Civil Cover Sheet, Amended Complaint upon AAA Insurance on 7/29/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMEND COMPLAINT against AAA Insurance, CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Diane Velasquez.(norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against AAA Insurance, CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Diane Velasquez.(norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Alain Wright on behalf of AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Rachel Alain Wright added to party AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wright, Rachel) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company from Conejos, Case Number 2021CV30007. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8197523), filed by AAA Insurance dba CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #7 Exhibit A-State Court Letter, #8 Exhibit A-State Court Order re Official Record and Use of Court Reporters, #9 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #10 Exhibit A-State Court Motion for Default Judgment, #11 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit A to Motion for Default Judgment, #12 Exhibit A-State Court Proposed Order to Motion for Default Judgment, #13 Exhibit A-State Court Order of Default Judgment, #14 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Hearing on Damages, #15 Exhibit A-State Court Entry of Appearance, #16 Exhibit A-State Court Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #17 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit A to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #18 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit B to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #19 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit C to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #20 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit D to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #21 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit E to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #22 Exhibit A-State Court Exhibit F to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #23 Exhibit A-State Court Proposed Order to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #24 Exhibit A-State Court Response to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #25 Exhibit A-State Court Reply to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #26 Exhibit A-State Court Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment, #27 Exhibit A-State Court Order Vacating December 2, 2021 Hearing, #28 Exhibit B-Registered voter information, #29 Exhibit C-Property record, #30 Exhibit D-Traffic Accident Report, #31 Exhibit E-CSAA's Periodic Report, #32 Exhibit F-Email from Plaintiff's counsel, #33 State Court Register of Actions, #34 Civil Cover Sheet, #35 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Alain Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell