This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:42:17 (UTC).

Vela v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Vela filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randy Crane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randy Crane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Elena Vela

San Antonio, TX 78212

Defendant

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Craig Mettenbrink

Attorney at Hirsch and Westheimer

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Hord, Jr

Attorney at Hirsch Westheimer PC

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-2772

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff to advise the Court whether she intends to prosecute her claims against Defendant. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

4 #1

Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #11

Exhibit D

1 #10

Exhibit C-7

1 #9

Exhibit C-6

1 #8

Exhibit C-5

1 #7

Exhibit C-4

1 #6

Exhibit C-3

1 #5

Exhibit C-2

1 #4

Exhibit C-1

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27569146) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit C-6, #10 Exhibit C-7, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Plaintiff to advise the Court whether she intends to prosecute her claims against Defendant. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randy Crane. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2022. Case called on docket. Counsel representing Plaintiff not present. Status of case discussed. The Court will set a status conference in two months by further order. Appearances: Michael F. Hord, Jr., Defendant.(ERO: Ricardo Rodriguez), filed.(DeliaRodriguez, 7) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for (Judgment on the Pleadings) Judgment by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27569146) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit C-6, #10 Exhibit C-7, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Foster Hord, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Craig Mettenbrink