This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:28 (UTC).

VEGA v. FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by VEGA against FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17054

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYNTHIA VEGA

Defendants

FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY

THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS

FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC.

XYZ CORP(S) (1-10)

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005335-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911971), filed by FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Scott Richardson, #3 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 11.2, #4 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Declaration of Scott Richardson

1 #3

Certification pursuant to Local Rule 11.2

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS identifying Foresters Financial Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#9) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYNTHIA VEGA re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration)(RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

3 #3

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Brief

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Support filed by CYNTHIA VEGA re #7 First MOTION to Remand (RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

15 #2

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) BRIEF in Opposition filed by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #7 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Richardson, #2 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#16

(#16) Exhibit to #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion Exhibit A to the Declaration of Scott Richardson by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

15 #1

Declaration of Scott Richardson

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#12

(#12) Stipulation and ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice and without costs as to THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, and FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/26/2019. (byl) Modified on 9/30/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Support filed by CYNTHIA VEGA re #7 First MOTION to Remand (RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Exhibit to #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion Exhibit A to the Declaration of Scott Richardson by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF in Opposition filed by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #7 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Richardson, #2 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 12:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 12/6/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/7/2019. (jqb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Stipulation and ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice and without costs as to THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, and FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/26/2019. (byl) Modified on 9/30/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's request to adjourn the motion to dismiss by two motion cycles, so that the District Court would resolve the motion to remand first, as well as Defendant's response [D.E. 5, 6, 8]. The Undersigned will take no action at this time on the request. The motions have been filed and will follow the briefing schedule under Local Civil Rule 78.1. The District Court will determine the order and timing of ruling on the motions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/24/2019. (MAH) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CYNTHIA VEGA re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration)(RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Arthur Raynes re #6 Letter. (RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #7 Plaintiff's First MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION to Remand by CYNTHIA VEGA. (Attachments: #1 Brief Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Declaration Counsel, #3 Declaration Plaintiff, #4 Text of Proposed Order Remand)(RAYNES, ARTHUR) Modified on 9/30/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Vincent N. Avallone re #4 Letter, #5 Letter. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Arthur Raynes. (RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Arthur Raynes. (RAYNES, ARTHUR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) Modified on 9/30/2019 (dam, ). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS identifying Foresters Financial Holding Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005335-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911971), filed by FORESTERS LIFE INSURANCE AND ANNUITY COMPANY, THE INDEPENDANT ORDER OF FORESTERS, FORESTERS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., FORESTERS INVESTOR SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Scott Richardson, #3 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 11.2, #4 Certificate of Service)(AVALLONE, VINCENT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.