This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:52:24 (UTC).

Vega-Rodriguez et al v. CPC Carolina PR, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Vega-Rodriguez filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against CPC Carolina PR, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01288

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo

Janet M Vega-Rodriguez

Janet Marie Vega-Rodriguez

Conjugal Partnership Nieves-Vega

Defendants

Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC

CPC Carolina PR, LLC

Jane Doe

KRB Universal Investments LLC

Insurance Company A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose L. Novas-Debien

Attorney at PMB 382

400 Calaf St.

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant Attorneys

Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Rebecca J. Canamero

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131

Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina

Attorney at Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

P.O. Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Jose L. Ramirez-Coll

Attorney at Antonetti Montalvo & Ramirez-Coll

Po Box 13128

San Juan, PR 00908

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Exhibit A

#30

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • (#32) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KRB Universal Investments LLC (gav) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER noted #30 Motion In Compliance. The Court has no objection to the consolidation of cases 19-cv-1288 and 19-cv-1989 with 18-cv-1555 if so ordered by Honorable William G. Young. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 07/11/2019. (dv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Motion In Compliance and Informing Consolidation Sought in case 18-01555 (WGY) as to #25 Scheduling Order/Case Management Order,, filed by Jose L. Novas-Debien on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Novas-Debien, Jose) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/11/19. (Arias-Marxuach, Raul) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Default Entry as to KRB Universal Investments LLC filed by Jose L. Novas-Debien on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Novas-Debien, Jose) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Non-Consent to Reference to Magistrate Judge by Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC re #25 Scheduling Order/Case Management Order,, (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed herein and pursuant to the authority conferred by Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) the Court sua sponte consolidates Civil Cases Nos. 19-1288 and 19-1289 (the Actions) for purposes of discovery only. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/10/19.(mrr) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 12/26/2019. Motions due by 5/26/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 07/08/2019.(dv) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon KRB Universal Investments LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Novas-Debien, Jose) (Entered: 07/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement byPuerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC identifying Other Affiliate CVS PR Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Other Affiliate CVS Health Corporation, Other Affiliate CVS PR Center, Inc. for Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC.. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of CPC Carolina PR, LLC Responses due by 5/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramirez-Coll, Jose) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline May 28, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/26/2019. (brc) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Arlyn Gonzalez-Diaz on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Gonzalez-Diaz, Arlyn) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 5/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***FILED IN ERROR. Duplicate filing as in D.E. #4 .*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo upon Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Novas-Debien, Jose) Modified on 4/9/2019 (ab). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo upon CPC Carolina PR, LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Novas-Debien, Jose) Modified on 4/9/2019 to add party and dates of service(ab). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to CPC Carolina PR, LLC, Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100063000) (arg) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ricardo Nieves-Acevedo. Service due by 7/1/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Novas-Debien, Jose) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPC Carolina PR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant