This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2020 at 09:28:30 (UTC).

Veenstra et al v. Little et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Veenstra filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Little. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Warren L. Hamilton

Boise, ID 83707

Jacob Wibberg

Boise, ID 83707

Daniel W. Perkins

Boise, ID 83707

Albert Pete Veenstra, III

Boise, ID 83707

Kenny Campbell

Boise, ID 83707

Todd A. Hogan

Boise, ID 83707

Robert Taylor

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

Idaho State Board of Correction

Jay Christensen

Greenland

Director IDOC Josh Tewalt

State of Idaho

Brad Little

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Minutes of the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee 01/28/2020 on OPE Report

#15

14 #1

Managing Correctional Capacity Evaluation Report

#14

#13

#12

#11

#7

#8

#6

4 #4

Wibberg In Forma Pauperis

4 #3

Campbell In Forma Pauperis

4 #2

Hamilton In Forma Pauperis

4 #1

Perkins In Forma Pauperis

#4

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 7/27/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Veenstra's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. If Plaintiff does not pay his proportional share of the filing fee ($57.14) within 28 days, this case may be dismissed, without prejudice, without further notice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER REQUEST by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III for a copy of docket sheet. (Docket sheet mailed to Mr. Veenstra)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Plaintiff Veenstra's Response to the OPE Report "Managing Correctional Capacity" by Albert Pete Veenstra, III (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Enter into the Record the Minutes of the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee 01/28/2020 on OPE Report 6 Pages by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Minutes of the Joint Legislative Oversight Committee 01/28/2020 on OPE Report) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Enter into the Record the Office of Performance Evaluation Report of 2020 "Managing Correctional Capacity" 75 Pages by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Managing Correctional Capacity Evaluation Report) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Albert Pete Veenstra, III (address updated on the docket) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Request the Court to Obtain and Enter into the Record a Copy of the Idaho Office of Performance Evaluations Report Dated 01/28/2020 "Managing Correctional Capacity" with Three Pages of Attachments by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 6/30/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION and ORDER OF SEVERANCE. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amendment, construed as a motion to file a supplement (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for class certification (contained in the Complaint) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Give Notice of Exhaustion (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Notice and Grant of General Authority/Power of Attorney of Parties in Interest (Dkt. #8 ), which also requests class certification, is REJECTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of Daniel W. Perkins, Warren L. Hamilton, Kenny Campbell, Jacob Wibberg, Todd A. Hogan, and Robert Taylor into six new cases. Plaintiffs' Motion to File Oversized in Forma Pauperis Applications (Dkt. 2) is MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for Leave to Request an Immediate Preliminary/Emergency Permanent Injunction Ordering Defendants to Reduce Every IDOC Prison Down to its Original Design Capacity, Request for Emergency Hearing by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 6/24/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for Leave to Give Notice of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies of Named Plaintiff by Albert Pete Veenstra, III (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Leave to Give Notice of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies of Named Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Daniel W. Perkins and Jacob Wibberg. Responses due by 6/10/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice and Grant of General Authority/Power of Attorney of Parties in Interest Pursuant to Rule 20 FRCP ( Responses due by 6/5/2020) by Plaintiffs Kenny Campbell, Warren L. Hamilton, Daniel W. Perkins, Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Jacob Wibberg. (ckh) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to File First Amendment to Complaint with One Attachment by Plaintiffs Kenny Campbell, Warren L. Hamilton, Daniel W. Perkins, Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Jacob Wibberg. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Hogan IFP, #2 Hogan Statement of Trust, #3 Taylor IFP, #4 Taylor Statement of Trust) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenny Campbell, Warren L. Hamilton, Daniel W. Perkins, Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Jacob Wibberg. (Attachments: #1 Perkins Statement of Trust Fund Account, #2 Hamilton Statement of Trust Fund Account, #3 Campbell Statement of Trust Fund Account, #4 Wibberg Statement of Trust Fund Account)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Kenny Campbell, Warren L. Hamilton, Daniel W. Perkins, Albert Pete Veenstra, III, Jacob Wibberg. Responses due by 6/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Perkins In Forma Pauperis, #2 Hamilton In Forma Pauperis, #3 Campbell In Forma Pauperis, #4 Wibberg In Forma Pauperis)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to File Oversized In Forma Pauperis Motions With Inmate Account Statements and Oversized Grant of General Authority/Power of Attorney of Parties of Interest Through The Courts ECF System by Plaintiff Albert Pete Veenstra, III. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Idaho State Board of Correction is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenland is a litigant