This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 20:57:52 (UTC).

Vector Licensing LLC v. FS.com Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 Vector Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against FS com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory B. Williams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01156

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vector Licensing LLC

Defendant

FS.com Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at Chong Law Firm, PA

2961 Centerville Rd., Ste 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Darlene Ghavimi

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Ste 650

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vector Licensing LLC as to FS.COM, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Amended Complaint to 11/28/2022 - filed by Vector Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by FS.com Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vector Licensing LLC.FS.com Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to FS.com Inc. on 8/31/2022. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vector Licensing LLC. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 9,686,655. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Related Cases

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ntl) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vector Licensing LLC as to FS.COM, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket(#10) ORAL ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, D.I. 8, the Court DENIES as MOOT Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), D.I. 7, as it relates to the Original Complaint, D.I. 1. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/27/22. (ntl) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Amended Complaint to 11/28/2022 filed by Vector Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/22/22. (ntl) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Amended Complaint to 11/28/2022 - filed by Vector Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against FS.com Inc.- filed by Vector Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by FS.com Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vector Licensing LLC.FS.com Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gregory B Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01156-GBW, 1:22-cv-01157-GBW, 1:22-cv-01158-GBW (rjb) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to FS.com Inc. on 8/31/2022. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vector Licensing LLC. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number 9,686,655. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against FS.com Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3949525.) - filed by Vector Licensing LLC.(Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2, #(3) Related Cases, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vector Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darlene Ghavimi