This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2022 at 21:05:48 (UTC).

VCS, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 VCS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mt Hawley Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld, Greg Gerard Guidry, Nannette Jolivette Brown and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Janis van Meerveld

Michael North

Presiding Judges

Greg Gerard Guidry

Nannette Jolivette Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VCS, LLC

Defendants

ARI Underwriters, Inc.

Mt. Hawley Insurance Company

ABC Insurance Company

DEF Insurance Company

Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC

Unidentified Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martha Y. Curtis

Attorney at Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC

909 Poydras St., 28Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112-1033

Ashley Gremillion Coker

Attorney at Sher Garner Cahill Richter Klein & Hilbert, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Ste 2800

New Orleans, LA 70112

Wade B Hammett

Attorney at Sher Garner Cahill Richter Klein & Hilbert, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, Ste 28Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

George Davidson Fagan

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Jessica Victoria Hidalgo

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Reagan Reynolds Wilty

Attorney at Smith & Fawer, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3702

New Orleans, LA 70170

Richard E. King

Attorney at Melchiode Marks King, LLC

639 Loyola Ave., Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70113

Greg K. Winslett

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeffery Bryan Struckhoff

Attorney at Melchiode Marks King, LLC

639 Loyola Ave., Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70113

Michael Feiler

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher R. Teske

Attorney at Pipes Miles Beckman, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Laura Spansel Gravener

Attorney at Pipes Miles Beckman, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 1800

New Orleans, LA 70124

 

Court Documents

48 #1

Remand letter

48 #48

Main Document

47 #1

Proposed Order

47 #47

Main Document

46 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

46 #1

Memorandum in Support

46 #46

Main Document

#45

(#45) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ARI Underwriters, Inc. (Hidalgo, Jessica) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

44 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

#1

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #10 Motion to Remand to State Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Remand letter) (jls) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Second Motion to Continue Submission Date on Mt. Hawley's Motion to Dismiss by VCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtis, Martha) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Second MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Mt. Hawley's Motion to Dismiss by VCS, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Curtis, Martha) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ARI Underwriters, Inc. (Hidalgo, Jessica) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2022, at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022, at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(tj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER GRANTING #42 MOTION for Expedited Hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #41 Motion to Continue is GRANTED. The submission date for Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's #7 Motion to Dismiss is hereby continued to 4/21/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/16/2021.(jls) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue the Submission Date on Mt. Hawley's Motion to Dismiss by VCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtis, Martha) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (jls). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Mt. Hawley's Motion to Dismiss by VCS, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Curtis, Martha) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Supplemental Brief filed by VCS, LLC, in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to Rec. Doc. 38. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Curtis, Martha) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (jls). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Supplemental Brief by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and ARI Underwriters, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Winslett, Greg) Modified text/filers on 3/15/2021 (jls). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by VCS, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Curtis, Martha) Modified event on 1/29/2021 (jls). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Jeffery Bryan Struckhoff is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/28/2021. (jls) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Jeffery B. Struckhoff by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial) by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(King, Richard) Modified text on 1/25/2021 (jls). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/21/2021. (jls) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/20/2021.(ko) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teske, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent to Removal by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and Marsh McLennan Agency, LLC (King, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 812-460 H (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8688200) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Richard E. King added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(King, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mt. Hawley Insurance Co. is a litigant