This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:37:08 (UTC).

VAZQUEZ v. CITY OF MEXICO BEACH

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 VAZQUEZ filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HECTOR VAZQUEZ

HECTOR VAZQUEZ doing business as CRAZY WAVE RUNNERS

Defendant

CITY OF MEXICO BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTINE DANIELLE SMALLWOOD MIRANDA

Attorney at SMALLWOOD MIRANDA LAW INC - PANAMA CITY FL

222 4Th Street

Panama City, FL 32401

MICHAEL JONATHAN HENRY

Attorney at DUNLAP & SHIPMAN PA - SANTA ROSA BEACH FL

2063 S County Highway 395

Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32459

JERRY LEWIS RUMPH, JR

Attorney at SWEETING & RUMPH PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

864 East Park Avenue

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM B GRAHAM

Attorney at CARR ALLISON - TALLAHASSEE FL

305 S Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER PLACING CASE IN ABEYANCE re #11 Notice of Settlement. This case is placed in abeyance while the parties' finalize their settlement, and the parties shall file a status report 60 days after the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter until the case is dismissed. (Status Report due by 12/18/2019.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/18/2019. (MB) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement & Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order. The deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order are stayed pending completion of mediation in the related Case No. 5:19cv15-TKW- MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by HECTOR VAZQUEZ. (RUMPH, JERRY) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

#7

Set Deadlines re #7 Order. Answer due by 10/7/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 14 days after the conclusion of mediation in the related case number 5:19cv15-TKW-MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/16/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#5

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (sdw) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/3/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Adverse Parties by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit to Notice of Removal

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER PLACING CASE IN ABEYANCE re #11 Notice of Settlement. This case is placed in abeyance while the parties' finalize their settlement, and the parties shall file a status report 60 days after the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter until the case is dismissed. (Status Report due by 12/18/2019.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/18/2019. (MB) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 NOTICE of Settlement & Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. (sdw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Settlement & Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (sdw) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order. The deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order are stayed pending completion of mediation in the related Case No. 5:19cv15-TKW- MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order. (sdw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/14/2019.) (sdw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by HECTOR VAZQUEZ. (RUMPH, JERRY) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines re #7 Order. Answer due by 10/7/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 14 days after the conclusion of mediation in the related case number 5:19cv15-TKW-MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/16/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (sdw) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (sdw) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/13/2019 to terminate motion (sdw). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/3/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to Adverse Parties by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH from Circuit, Bay County, case number 19002978CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4606666.), filed by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less