This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 08:27:50 (UTC).

Vazquez v. Capio Partners LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Vazquez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capio Partners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Merryday and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01629

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Vazquez

Defendants

Capio Partners LLC

CF Medical LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Tenenbaum

Tenenbaum Law Group, Pllc, 1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, 10Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Megan Fleishman

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Drive, Suite 195

Tampa, FL 33618

Dayle Marie Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

Michael Schuette

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr. Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Schuette on behalf of CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Capio Partners LLC.(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Capio Partners LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capio Asset Servicing, LLC for Capio Partners LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) Modified on 7/25/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by CF Medical LLC.(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CF Medical LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capio Asset Holdings, LLC for CF Medical LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) Modified on 7/25/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. Related case(s): No (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Rachel Megan Fleishman on behalf of CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. Lead Counsel: Rachel M. Fleishman. (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Teresa Vazquez. (Tenenbaum, Jason) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER denying without prejudice #12--motion to remand; granting #13--motion to stay; staying the action; directing the clerk to administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/5/2022. (GG) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

15 #15

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC re #14 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase Stayed. (CTR) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER denying without prejudice #12--motion to remand; granting #13--motion to stay; staying the action; directing the clerk to administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/5/2022. (GG) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Teresa Vazquez. (Tenenbaum, Jason) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Rachel Megan Fleishman on behalf of CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. Lead Counsel: Rachel M. Fleishman. (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. Related case(s): No (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CF Medical LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capio Asset Holdings, LLC for CF Medical LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) Modified on 7/25/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by CF Medical LLC.(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Capio Partners LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capio Asset Servicing, LLC for Capio Partners LLC. (Fleishman, Rachel) Modified on 7/25/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Capio Partners LLC.(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Schuette on behalf of CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Rachel Megan Fleishman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-1629-SDM-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit, Pasco County, Florida, case number 2002CA001535CAAXWS filed in State Court on 06/09/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19783682 filed by CF Medical LLC, Capio Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less