This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 07:51:17 (UTC).

Vazquez-Padilla v. Cognizant Technology Solutions, U.S. Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Vazquez-Padilla filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Cognizant Technology Solutions, U S Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00572

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zuania Vazquez-Padilla

Defendant

Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Paul Lechner

Defendant Attorneys

Alysa Jane Ward

Diana Nicole Evans

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Hillsborough County, case number 21-CA-009723 filed in State Court on 12/08/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19332719 filed by Cognizant Technology Solutions, U.S. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All State Court Filings, #2 State Court Complaint , #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Alysa) Modified on 3/14/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - All State Court Filings

1 #2

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alysa Jane Ward on behalf of Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corp.. Lead Counsel: Alysa J. Ward. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after the case was removed for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/16/2022. (SMR) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation.(Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): No (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp. for Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. Related case(s): Yes (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jay Paul Lechner on behalf of Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. Lead Counsel: Jay P. Lechner. (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jay Paul Lechner on behalf of Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. Lead Counsel: Jay P. Lechner. (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zuania Vazquez-Padilla. Related case(s): Yes (Lechner, Jay) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp. for Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): No (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation.(Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after the case was removed for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/16/2022. (SMR) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alysa Jane Ward on behalf of Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corp.. Lead Counsel: Alysa J. Ward. (Ward, Alysa) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0572-KKM-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Hillsborough County, case number 21-CA-009723 filed in State Court on 12/08/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19332719 filed by Cognizant Technology Solutions, U.S. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All State Court Filings, #2 State Court Complaint , #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Alysa) Modified on 3/14/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less