This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 09:02:18 (UTC).

Vaughns v. State of Georgia

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Vaughns filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Johnny L. Vaughns

Respondents

. State of Georgia

State of Georgia

Not Classified By Court

Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Meghan H. Hill

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

40 Capitol Sq., Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of State of Georgia (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan H. Hill on behalf of State of Georgia (Hill, Meghan) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Supersedas Bona Fide Federal Bail Bond Appellate de novo. The Court hereby ORDERS Respondent to answer in writing the allegations of the petition within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/28/21. (loh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny L. Vaughns. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Supersedas Bona Fide Federal Bail Bond Appellate de novo by Johnny L. Vaughns. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of State of Georgia (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan H. Hill on behalf of State of Georgia (Hill, Meghan) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/27/2021. (loh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Supersedas Bona Fide Federal Bail Bond Appellate de novo. The Court hereby ORDERS Respondent to answer in writing the allegations of the petition within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 4/28/21. (loh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny L. Vaughns. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(pts) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(ca) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Supersedas Bona Fide Federal Bail Bond Appellate de novo by Johnny L. Vaughns. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnny L. Vaughns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ca) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan Hobbs Hill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith