This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:51:53 (UTC).

Vaughn v. Detention Officer Mains, et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Vaughn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Detention Officer Mains. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-02072

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr

Waterloo, IA 50703

Defendants

Nathan Neff

Black Hawk County Sheriff's Department

Detention Officer Mains

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr. (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(Nef mailed to plaintiff). (ac) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER re #1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr. Plaintiff's motion did not include a copy of his trust fund account statement or similar document. Accordingly, plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis which complies with the rules. If plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the standard motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/17/20. (ksy)(copy w/NEF and IFP form to Plf) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #2

Exhibits

1 #1

1983 Petition

#1

(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr (Attachments: #1 1983 Petition, #2 Exhibits) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr. (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(Nef mailed to plaintiff). (ac) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER re #1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr. Plaintiff's motion did not include a copy of his trust fund account statement or similar document. Accordingly, plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis which complies with the rules. If plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the standard motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/17/20. (ksy)(copy w/NEF and IFP form to Plf) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian Dana Vaughn, Jr (Attachments: #1 1983 Petition, #2 Exhibits) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less