This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 08:43:51 (UTC).

VAUGHAN et al v. TECHNOGYM USA CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 VAUGHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TECHNOGYM USA CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are JUAN R. SANCHEZ and JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREEM VAUGHAN

CARLA VAUGHAN

Defendants

MASS MOVEMENT, INC.

TECHNOGYM USA CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES B. DILSHEIMER

Attorney at STAMPONE O'BRIEN DILSHEIMAR

500 Cottman Avenue

Cheltenham, PA 19012

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit

#7

7 #1

Exhibit

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaims , CROSSCLAIM against TECHNOGYM USA CORP. by MASS MOVEMENT, INC..(NOYE, HENRY) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Summons and Complaint upon Technogym by Certified Mail on 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DILSHEIMER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Summons and Complaint upon Mass Movement Inc by Certified Mail on 1/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DILSHEIMER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ TO HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 02/25/2020. 02/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT MASS MOVEMENT, INC. TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO A DATE THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/20/20. 2/20/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint To Extend Time to Answer by MASS MOVEMENT, INC.. (NOYE, HENRY) Modified on 3/5/2020 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY J. NOYE on behalf of MASS MOVEMENT, INC. (NOYE, HENRY) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket2 Summons Issued as to MASS MOVEMENT, INC., TECHNOGYM USA CORP.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/21/2020 (bw, ) Modified on 1/21/2020 (bw, ). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CAREEM VAUGHAN, CARLA VAUGHAN. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MASS MOVEMENT, INC., TECHNOGYM USA CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209952.), filed by CAREEM VAUGHAN, CARLA VAUGHAN.(bw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TECHNOGYM USA CORP is a litigant