This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2021 at 07:13:08 (UTC).

VASWANI, INC. v. MANJUNATHAMURTHY et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 VASWANI, INC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against MANJUNATHAMURTHY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katharine S. Hayden and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-20288

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katharine S. Hayden

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vaswani, Inc

VASWANI, INC.

Defendants

NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN

POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

RADHIKA RAO

SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH

FAIRMACS GROUP

DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD

LUCIDIENT LIMITED

VISIO INGENII, LTD

FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD

JOANN CASTILLO

VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD

NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY

UDAY SHAKAR

SUNIL BUVA

UDAY SHANKAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM H. YOST, III

WILLIAM JOSEPH PALLAS, III

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR. (PALLAS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR.(PALLAS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VASWANI, INC.. FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUNIL BUVA, JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHANKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

2 #14

Summons Visiolucid Technosoft

2 #13

Summons Visio Ingenii Ltd

2 #12

Summons Sunil Buva

2 #11

Summons Uday Shankar

2 #10

Summons Radhika Rao

2 #7

Summons Nanjundappa Madhusudhan

2 #6

Summons Lucidient Ltd

2 #5

Summons Joann Costillo

2 #3

Summons Fairmacs Group

2 #2

Summons Draft Cargoway India

2 #1

Summons Bangalore Manjunathamurthy

#2

(#2) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civi Cover Sheet by Vaswani, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bangalore Manjunathamurthy, #2 Summons Draft Cargoway India, #3 Summons Fairmacs Group, #4 Summons Fairmacs Shipping & Transport, #5 Summons Joann Costillo, #6 Summons Lucidient Ltd, #7 Summons Nanjundappa Madhusudhan, #8 Summons Powerfirm Ventures, #9 Summons Sreenath Rajendhranath, #10 Summons Radhika Rao, #11 Summons Uday Shankar, #12 Summons Sunil Buva, #13 Summons Visio Ingenii Ltd, #14 Summons Visiolucid Technosoft)(BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHAKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11875226), filed by Vaswani, Inc.(BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. YOST, III on behalf of DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR (YOST, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR. (PALLAS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, UDAY SHANKAR.(PALLAS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VASWANI, INC.. FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUNIL BUVA, JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHANKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civi Cover Sheet by Vaswani, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bangalore Manjunathamurthy, #2 Summons Draft Cargoway India, #3 Summons Fairmacs Group, #4 Summons Fairmacs Shipping & Transport, #5 Summons Joann Costillo, #6 Summons Lucidient Ltd, #7 Summons Nanjundappa Madhusudhan, #8 Summons Powerfirm Ventures, #9 Summons Sreenath Rajendhranath, #10 Summons Radhika Rao, #11 Summons Uday Shankar, #12 Summons Sunil Buva, #13 Summons Visio Ingenii Ltd, #14 Summons Visiolucid Technosoft)(BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOANN CASTILLO, DRAFT CARGOWAY INDIA, PVT, LTD, FAIRMACS GROUP, FAIRMACS SHIPPING & TRANSPORT SERVICES, PVT, LTD, LUCIDIENT LIMITED, NANJUNDAPPA MADHUSUDHAN, NAGACHETAN BANGALORE MANJUNATHAMURTHY, POWERFIRM VENTURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., SREENATH RAJENDHRANATH, RADHIKA RAO, UDAY SHAKAR, VISIO INGENII, LTD, VISIOLUCID TECHNOSOFT, PVT, LTD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11875226), filed by Vaswani, Inc.(BALDINGER, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less