This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:43:21 (UTC).

VASQUEZ v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06852

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLE VASQUEZ

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J. Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Vasquez against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8957098 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Gratiot County - County Where Action Arose: Gratiot County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Southern District of Indiana, 1:14-ml-2570; MDL2570, Judge Richard L. Young] (Thompson, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC* (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-213) for MDL # 2570. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#4

(#4) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-213) to Southern District of Indiana for MDL # 2570. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#6) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/29/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#10

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by NICOLE VASQUEZ.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff NICOLE VASQUEZ. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of MDL Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04805-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01138-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01471-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01595-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01601-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01605-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01621-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01635-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01637-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01644-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-01646-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06580-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06847-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06855-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06871-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06872-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06873-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff NICOLE VASQUEZ. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by NICOLE VASQUEZ.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket(#7) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Kansas, Cause No. 2:22-cv-2237 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6850-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 1:22-cv-1628 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6851-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Michigan, Cause No. 1:22-cv-11415 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6852-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Cause No. 5:22-cv-1670 on 7/20/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6853-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Texas, Cause No. 7:22-cv-209 on 7/29/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6854-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06850-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06851-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06852-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06853-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06854-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Third Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/29/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-11415. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-213) to Southern District of Indiana for MDL # 2570. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-213) for MDL # 2570. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC* (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Vasquez against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8957098 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Gratiot County - County Where Action Arose: Gratiot County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Southern District of Indiana, 1:14-ml-2570; MDL2570, Judge Richard L. Young] (Thompson, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kip S.M. McDonald