This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 10:47:14 (UTC).

Vaseleros-Stevenson v. Calvert County, Maryland et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Vaseleros-Stevenson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Calvert County, Maryland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Messitte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01917

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Messitte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson

Defendants

Timothy Price

Maryland Calvert County

Timothy Lewis

Calvert County, Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard E Schimel

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard E Schimel

7315 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 800 West

Bethesda, MD 20814-3206

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Douglas Peter

Attorney at Local Government Insurance Trust

7225 Parkway Dr

Hanover, MD 21076

John F Breads, Jr

Attorney at Local Government Insurance Trust

7225 Parkway Dr

Hanover, MD 21076

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corrected REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Calvert County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Breads, John) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

5 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 7

5 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 6

5 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 5

5 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 4

5 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 3

5 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 2

5 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 1

5 #3

Exhibit List

5 #2

Memorandum in Support

5 #1

Table of Contents

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy Lewis (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Peter, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Timothy Lewis(Peter, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Calvert County, Maryland, Timothy Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #9 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Dispositive Motions (until 8/31/2020). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/18/2020. (jmhs, Chambers) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corrected REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Timothy Lewis (until 8/4/2020). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/6/2020. (jmhs, Chambers) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Calvert County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Breads, John) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy Lewis (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Peter, Matthew) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Timothy Lewis(Peter, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Calvert County, Maryland, Timothy Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8723550.), filed by Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8723532.), filed by Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson.(Schimel, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less