This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:22:08 (UTC).

Vascular Solutions LLC et al v. Medtronic, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Vascular Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01760

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Vascular Solutions, LLC

Arrow International, Inc.

Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.

Teleflex LLC

Vascular Solutions LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Medtronic Vascular, Inc.

Medtronic, Inc

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

J Derek Vandenburgh

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Alexander S Rinn

Attorney at Carlson Caspers

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Shelleaha L Jonas

Attorney at Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh Lindquist and Schuman PA

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 4200, Minneapolis

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Tara C Norgard

Attorney at Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh Lindquist & Schuman PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 4200

Mpls, MN 55402

Joseph W Winkels

Attorney at Carlson Caspers

225 South 6Th St, #4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Katherine J Rahlin

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lora Mitchell Friedemann

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

200 S 6Th St Ste 4000

Mpls, MN 55402-1425

Kurt J Niederluecke

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

200 S 6Th St Ste 4000

Mpls, MN 55402-1425

Anne E. Rondoni Tavernier

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Laura L Myers

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

200 S 6Th St Ste 4000

Mpls, MN 55402-1425

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Myers, Laura) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

15 #1

Consent Form

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Rahlin, Katherine) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#13

(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Status Conference held on 7/18/2019. (HAM) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Medtronic plc, a publicly held company, is the ultimate parent company for Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic Vascular, Inc. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of Medtronic plc stock. (Niederluecke, Kurt) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J Niederluecke on behalf of All Defendants. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vascular Solutions LLC, Teleflex LLC, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.. Medtronic Vascular, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vascular Solutions LLC, Teleflex LLC, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.. Medtronic, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. Judge Joan N. Ericksen no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1760 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/9/2019(MMG) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (MMG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Teleflex Incorporated is a corporate parent of Plaintiffs Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l., Teleflex LLC, Vascular Solutions, LLC. Teleflex Incorporated is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiffs Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l., Teleflex LLC, Vascular Solutions, LLC. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #17

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #16

Exhibit(s) P

1 #15

Exhibit(s) O

1 #14

Exhibit(s) N

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Myers, Laura) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Rahlin, Katherine) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Status Conference held on 7/18/2019. (HAM) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#12) (Text-only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. On or before 12:00 p.m. on Wednesday, July 17, 2019, counsel for each party shall submit a CONFIDENTIAL letter via e-mail to the Court at leung_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. The confidential letter should set forth with reasonable specificity a brief history of the parties' dispute; the relative strengths and weaknesses of each party's position; what efforts, if any, the parties have made to resolve the potential motion for a preliminary injunction; the last position of each party regarding a preliminary injunction; and a litigation budget for the motion for a preliminary injunction. The parties' letters shall not exceed three pages. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/15/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#11) (Text-only) NOTICE: Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (JRE) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Medtronic plc, a publicly held company, is the ultimate parent company for Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic Vascular, Inc. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of Medtronic plc stock. (Niederluecke, Kurt) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt J Niederluecke on behalf of All Defendants. (Niederluecke, Kurt) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vascular Solutions LLC, Teleflex LLC, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.. Medtronic Vascular, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vascular Solutions LLC, Teleflex LLC, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.. Medtronic, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. Judge Joan N. Ericksen no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1760 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/9/2019(MMG) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (MMG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1760 JNE/TNL. (MMG) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Teleflex Incorporated is a corporate parent of Plaintiffs Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l., Teleflex LLC, Vascular Solutions, LLC. Teleflex Incorporated is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiffs Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l., Teleflex LLC, Vascular Solutions, LLC. (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Medtronic Vascular, Inc., Medtronic, Inc (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6976431) filed by Vascular Solutions, LLC, Teleflex LLC, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Innovations S.a.r.l.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vandenburgh, J) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Vascular, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arrow International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vascular Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Teleflex Incorporated is a litigant