This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2021 at 08:50:21 (UTC).

Vascassenno v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Vascassenno filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Vascassenno

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Powers Glenn

Attorney at Griffith Law

256 Seaboard Lane, Suite E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Jonathan L. Griffith

Attorney at Griffith Law

256 Seaboard Lane, Suite E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant Attorney

Thomas W. Tucker, III

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas W. Tucker III

1345 Tilton Drive

Franklin, TN 37067

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Initial filed by Target Corporation. (Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS returned executed by Heather Vascassenno. Target Corporation served on 07/08/2021. (Glenn, Craig) Modified on 7/30/2021 (ln). (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to Target Corporation Acknowledgement filed by Heather Vascassenno. (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas W. Tucker, III admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tucker, III on behalf of Target Corporation (Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons issued as to Target Corporation. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUBPOENA issued to Sedgwick Claims by Heather Vascassenno (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Target Corporation. (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/16/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Craig Powers Glenn and Jonathan L. Griffith admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Target Corporation (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3393654) filed by Heather Vascassenno. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Powers Glenn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L. Griffith