This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2022 at 08:00:11 (UTC).

Varvel v. American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC) et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Varvel filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus AFLAC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas B. Russell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas B. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Varvel

Defendants

American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC)

Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Troutman

Attorney at Edwards & Kautz, PLLC

P. O. Box 1837

Paducah, KY 42002-0269

Mark Edwards

Attorney at Edwards & Kautz, PLLC

P. O. Box 1837

Paducah, KY 42002-0269

Defendant Attorney

Michelle Ann Turner

Attorney at Turner, Keal & Button PLLC

10624 Meeting Street, Suite 101

Prospect, KY 40059

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Appendix 1 - summons and complaint (Aflac)

1 #2

Appendix 2 - summons and complaint (Guardian)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aflac Incorporated for American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC). (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel, Trigg Circuit Court (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Agreed Order extending answer deadline to 3/10/22 by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Agreed Order further extending answer deadline by 2 weeks by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#7

(#7) AGREED ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/16/2022.Extending time for Defendants to answer up to and including 3/24/2022. cc: Counsel(KPH) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order Prop Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/25/2022. Granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/29/2022 Dismissing Case. cc:counsel (KJA) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#12

(#12) Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Settled by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC). (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Agreed Order Dismissing Settled by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC). (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/29/2022 Dismissing Case. cc:counsel (KJA) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/25/2022. Granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. cc: Counsel(KJA) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Notice to Dismiss ; Error:wrong event selected; Correction:notified counsel of error and changed docket entry to motion by the Court (KPH) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Dismiss by Gary Varvel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order) (Troutman, David) Modified on 3/23/2022 change event to motion (KPH). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/16/2022.Extending time for Defendants to answer up to and including 3/24/2022. cc: Counsel(KPH) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Agreed Order further extending answer deadline by 2 weeks by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Agreed Order extending answer deadline to 3/10/22 by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC), Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Turner, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel, Trigg Circuit Court (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aflac Incorporated for American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC). (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC) from Trigg Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00004. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3528579), filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (AFLAC). (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - summons and complaint (Aflac), #2 Appendix 2 - summons and complaint (Guardian), #3 Cover Sheet) (JM) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Ann Turner