This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 09:28:26 (UTC).

Varney v. Valley Health Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Varney filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Valley Health Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Varney

Defendant

Valley Health Care, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erika Klie Kolenich

Attorney at Klie Law Offices, P.L.L.C.

85 West Main Street

Buckhannon, WV 26201

Defendant Attorney

Marla N Presley

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Motions due by 3/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Settlement Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 7/6/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021, 7/7/21, 7/8/21 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/16/20. (njz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's Other Document Request to Defendant Valley Health Care, Inc. to Name a 30(B)(6) Corporate Designee and to Produce the Designee for Deposition filed by Brenda Varney. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Varney Initial Disclosures. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#6

(#6) AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS COUNT V OF COMPLAINT: granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/21/20. (njz) cert copies mailed to counsel of record (Entered: 08/21/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Complaint by Brenda Varney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Health Care, Inc.. (Presley, Marla) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Valley Health Care, Inc..(Presley, Marla) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/31/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/28/20. (njz) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-Notice of Filing

1 #3

Exhibit C-Cased Information

1 #2

Exhibit B-Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Randolph County, (case number 20-C-54) filed by Valley Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Case Information, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3081821(njz) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Motions due by 3/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Settlement Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 7/6/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021, 7/7/21, 7/8/21 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/16/20. (njz) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Other Document Request to Defendant Valley Health Care, Inc. to Name a 30(B)(6) Corporate Designee and to Produce the Designee for Deposition filed by Brenda Varney. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Varney Initial Disclosures. (Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS COUNT V OF COMPLAINT: granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/21/20. (njz) cert copies mailed to counsel of record (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Complaint by Brenda Varney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Kolenich, Erika) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valley Health Care, Inc.. (Presley, Marla) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Valley Health Care, Inc..(Presley, Marla) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/31/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/14/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/28/20. (njz) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Randolph County, (case number 20-C-54) filed by Valley Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Case Information, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3081821(njz) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less