This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:31:23 (UTC).

Varner v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Varner filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02134

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dayna Varner

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant

Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Chamless Lane

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm

6200 Savoy Drive, Ste 1150

Houston, TX 77036-3300

Defendant Attorney

Lauren N Beverly

Attorney at Settle Pou

3333 Lee Pkwy, 8Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

#11

(#11) Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that the parties want to dismiss this case, it is dismissed with prejudice #10 . Case terminated on 7/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Dayna Varner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE)(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Judgment by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #3

Exhibit 3

9 #4

Exhibit 4

9 #5

Exhibit 5

9 #6

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#5

(#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed.(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 190th Judicial District Court, case number 201937730 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22607932) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit C3, #6 Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit C5, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that the parties want to dismiss this case, it is dismissed with prejudice #10 . Case terminated on 7/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Dayna Varner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE)(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Judgment by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Dayna Varner, filed.(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed.(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 190th Judicial District Court, case number 201937730 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22607932) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit C3, #6 Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit C5, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beverly, Lauren) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.