This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 07:26:46 (UTC).

Varnadoe et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corp., et al.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2022 Varnadoe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corp . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00925

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jason Varnadoe

Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe

Defendants

BNSF Railway Company

National Railroad Passenger Corp.

Amtrak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey P Goodman

Attorney at Saltz Mongeluzzi Bendesky P.C.

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St. Fl 52

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert J Mongeluzzi

Attorney at Saltz Mongeluzzi Barrett & Bendesky, P.C.

One Liberty Place, 52Nd Flr, 1650 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Samuel B. Dordick

Attorney at Saltz Mongeluzzi & Bendesky P.C.

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St. Fl 52

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Adam J. Levitt

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Sixth Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Mark S Landman

Attorney at Landman, Corsi, Ballaine & Ford, P.C.

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Susan Kay Laing

Attorney at Anderson Rasor & Partners, LLP

150 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 350

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on the parties' joint status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/12/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/15/2022 at 9:00 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A further joint status report is to be filed on 6/8/2022. (mk) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#16

(#16) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp.(Laing, Susan) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 4/14/2022 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#14

(#14) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BNSF Railway Company (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Liability (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Mark S Landman (Landman, Mark) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Susan Kay Laing (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

8 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Robert J. Mongeluzzi's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #2 is granted. Jeffrey P. Goodman's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #3 is granted. Samuel B. Dordick's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/23/2022: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178240. (Dordick, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178183. (Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178100. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19175708. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on the parties' joint status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/12/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/15/2022 at 9:00 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A further joint status report is to be filed on 6/8/2022. (mk) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp.(Laing, Susan) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 4/14/2022 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/2022. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BNSF Railway Company (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Railroad Passenger Corp. (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Liability (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Mark S Landman (Landman, Mark) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNSF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corp. by Susan Kay Laing (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe. National Railroad Passenger Corp. waiver sent on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Robert J. Mongeluzzi's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #2 is granted. Jeffrey P. Goodman's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #3 is granted. Samuel B. Dordick's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/23/2022: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178240. (Dordick, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178183. (Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-19178100. (Mongeluzzi, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jason Varnadoe, Estates of Donald Varnadoe and Marjorie Varnadoe ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19175708. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTRAK is a litigant

Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Seth Landman