This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:35:45 (UTC).

Variety Stores, Inc. et al v. Martinsville Plaza, LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Variety Stores, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martinsville Plaza, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jackson L. Kiser. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jackson L. Kiser

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Variety Stores, Inc.

Variety Wholesalers, Inc.

Defendant

Martinsville Plaza, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Sheridan Brennan, Sr.

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP

707 E. Main Street, Suite 1700

Richmond, VA 23218

Ashley Goin Moss

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP

707 E. Main Street, Suite 1700

Richmond, VA 23218

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Stephen Setliff

Attorney at Setliff Law, P.C.

4940 Dominion Boulevard

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Peter Erich Schurig

Attorney at Setliff Law, P.C.

4940 Dominion Boulevard

Glen Allen, VA 23060

Kevin Thomas Streit

Attorney at Setliff Law

4940 Dominion Boulevard

Glen Allen, VA 23060

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . filed by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Streit, Kevin)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Streit, Kevin)

#8

(#8) Paper State Court Records received from Henry County Circuit Court, CL20000818-00. (ham)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/3/2020. (ham)

#6

(#6) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Henry County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/3/2020. (Certified copy mailed to Henry County Circuit Court via First Class Mail).(ham)

#5

(#5) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Variety Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Variety Wholesalers, Inc. for Variety Stores, Inc.. (Moss, Ashley)

#4

(#4) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Variety Wholesalers, Inc. (Moss, Ashley)

#3

(#3) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Martinsville Plaza, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Washington Prime Group Inc. for Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Schurig, Peter)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Schurig, Peter)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry County Circuit Court, case number CL20818, filed by Martinsville Plaza, LLC. (Filing & Administrative fee $400, receipt number 0423-344718). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . filed by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Streit, Kevin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Streit, Kevin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 - 3/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ham)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Paper State Court Records received from Henry County Circuit Court, CL20000818-00. (ham)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/3/2020. (ham)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Henry County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/3/2020. (Certified copy mailed to Henry County Circuit Court via First Class Mail).(ham)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Variety Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Variety Wholesalers, Inc. for Variety Stores, Inc.. (Moss, Ashley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Variety Wholesalers, Inc. (Moss, Ashley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Martinsville Plaza, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Washington Prime Group Inc. for Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Schurig, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing Requirement to Martinsville Plaza, LLC., Variety Stores, Inc., Variety Wholesalers, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Martinsville Plaza, LLC.. (Schurig, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry County Circuit Court, case number CL20818, filed by Martinsville Plaza, LLC. (Filing & Administrative fee $400, receipt number 0423-344718). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

    Read MoreRead Less