This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2022 at 08:15:16 (UTC).

Raul Vargas v. Universal Studios Hollywood et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Raul Vargas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Universal Studios Hollywood. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04337

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raul Vargas

Defendants

Universal Studios Hollywood

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Universal City Studios LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silvia Elizabeth Luna

Attorney at Luna Legal Firm

16501 Ventura Blvd. Suite 400

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Amber L Roller

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David H Raizman

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jan Nicholas Marfori

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Having considered the Joint Notice of Settlement #14 1. All deadlines governing this action are vacated.2. The court DISMISSES the action without prejudice. The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 60 days. 3. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require approval of the court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 8/10/2022 (lc). (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant Universal Studios Hollywood. (Roller, Amber) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#13

(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Studios Hollywood.. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. pdf document is type attached at the end of filed document. MISSING LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Studios Hollywood, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 served on June 29, 2022. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER RE upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood, identifying NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood identifying NBCUniversal Media, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit C Documents served on Defendant

1 #2

Exhibit B Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Having considered the Joint Notice of Settlement #14 1. All deadlines governing this action are vacated.2. The court DISMISSES the action without prejudice. The court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 60 days. 3. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require approval of the court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 8/10/2022 (lc). (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant Universal Studios Hollywood. (Roller, Amber) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Studios Hollywood.. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. pdf document is type attached at the end of filed document. MISSING LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Studios Hollywood, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 served on June 29, 2022. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Universal City Studios LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/22/22 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-2 AS EXHIBIT B](rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Studios Hollywood. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Raul Vargas. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/23/22 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-1 AS EXHIBIT A] (rolm) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood, identifying NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood identifying NBCUniversal Media, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood. (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV16953 Receipt No: ACACDC-33522850 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Universal Studios Hollywood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Answer, #3 Exhibit C Documents served on Defendant) (Attorney Jan Nicholas Marfori added to party Universal Studios Hollywood(pty:dft))(Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less