This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 09:05:24 (UTC).

Vargas v. Norris et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Vargas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Norris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar, Gregory J. Fouratt and David H. Urias. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

John F. Robbenhaar

David H. Urias

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Vargas

Defendants

Mark Norris

Michael Radosevich

Jimmie Jones

Joshua Rogers

Lena Deyapp

City of Albuquerque

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joleen K. Youngers

Attorney at Almanzar & Youngers, P.A.

Po Box 16089

Las Cruces, NM 88004-6089

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Shannon L Kennedy

Attorney at The Kennedy Law Firm, P.C.

1000 2Nd St. Nw, 87102

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Jonlyn M Martinez

Attorney at Law Firm of Jonlyn M. Martinez

P O Box 1805, 105 14Th St. Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1805

Aaron Scott Holloman

One Civic Plaza

Ste 4Th Floor, RO 4072

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) NOTICE by City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers Consent to Removal (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Lena Deyapp, Mark Norris Consent to Removal (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers. (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Client attendance is not required. Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/13/2022. (gbg) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER ALLOWING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#13

(#13) Joint Status Report by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Vargas Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin Vargas Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement (Kennedy, Shannon) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Status Report by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER ALLOWING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Client attendance is not required. Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/13/2022. (gbg) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Albuquerque, Lena Deyapp, Jimmie Jones, Mark Norris, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers. (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Lena Deyapp, Mark Norris Consent to Removal (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers Consent to Removal (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Transmittal of State Court Documents by City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones, Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers (Holloman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB052068 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jimmie Jones, Joshua Rogers, City of Albuquerque, Michael Radosevich from Second Judicial District Court, case number 20cv3005., filed by Jimmie Jones, Joshua Rogers, City of Albuquerque, Michael Radosevich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) filed by Michael Radosevich, Joshua Rogers, City of Albuquerque, Jimmie Jones (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jimmie Jones, Joshua Rogers, City of Albuquerque, Michael Radosevich from Second Judicial District Court, case number 20cv3005., filed by Jimmie Jones, Joshua Rogers, City of Albuquerque, Michael Radosevich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonlyn M Martinez