Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 07:05:00 (UTC).

Vargas v. Norman City of et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Vargas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Norman City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00805

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Vargas

Defendants

Aury Barrett

Norman Police Department

Norman City of

Nathaniel Worthley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua S Turner

Attorney at Talley Turner & Bertman PC

219 E Main St

Norman, OK 73069

Defendant Attorneys

Rickey J Knighton, II

Attorney at City Attorney's Ofc-NORMAN

P O Box 370

Norman, OK 73070

Jeanne M Snider

Attorney at City Attorney's Ofc-NORMAN

P O Box 370, 201 W Gray St, Suite A

Norman, OK 73070

Kristina L Bell

Attorney at City Attorney's Ofc-NORMAN

P O Box 370

Norman, OK 73070

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Attachment A - Order in Hodge v. Keene, et al.

#7

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Order in Hodge v. Keene, et al.)(Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Angel Vargas. (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua S Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Rickey J Knighton, II on behalf of Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley (Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Turner EOA

1 #3

Exhibit 3 -State Court Petition

1 #2

Exhibit 2- State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-1090 filed by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 -State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Turner EOA)(rb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Order in Hodge v. Keene, et al.)(Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Angel Vargas. (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua S Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Rickey J Knighton, II on behalf of Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley (Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2989810. (Knighton, Rickey) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-1090 filed by Aury Barrett, Norman City of, Norman Police Department, Nathaniel Worthley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 -State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Turner EOA)(rb) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Norman Police Department is a litigant