This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 07:27:55 (UTC).

Vardamaskos v. Long Island Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Vardamaskos filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Long Island Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09850

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niki Vardamaskos

Defendant

Long Island Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Twyman Wietzke

Attorney at Flynn & Wietzke, P.C.

1205 Franklin Avenue

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 10/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17830299)Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos.(Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff name contains a typographical error on caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 10/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17830299)Document filed by Niki Vardamaskos.(Wietzke, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less