This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:29:51 (UTC).

VANTERPOOL v. CITY OF JERSEY CITY et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 VANTERPOOL filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CITY OF JERSEY CITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-20834

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIARA VANTERPOOL

Defendants

JANE DOES (1-10)

JOHN DOES (1-10)

TAMIKA McREYNOLDS

CITY OF JERSEY CITY

ARTHUR WILLIAMS

MARK BUNBURY

ABC CORPORATION (1-10)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER C. ROBERTS

7 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 108

East Orange, NJ 07017

Defendant Attorneys

FRANCIS A. KENNY

Attorney at LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG LLC

570 Broad Street, Suite 1201

Newark, NJ 07102

VICTOR A. AFANADOR

Attorney at LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG, LLC

570 Broad Street, Suite 1201

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Brief

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10143556) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIARA VANTERPOOL.(ROBERTS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS A. KENNY on behalf of MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS (KENNY, FRANCIS) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(AFANADOR, VICTOR) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter from Francis A. Kenny to the Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (KENNY, FRANCIS) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Francis A. Kenny to the Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (KENNY, FRANCIS) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS A. KENNY on behalf of MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS (KENNY, FRANCIS) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(AFANADOR, VICTOR) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK BUNBURY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, TAMIKA McREYNOLDS, ARTHUR WILLIAMS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10143556) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIARA VANTERPOOL.(ROBERTS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.