This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:38:14 (UTC).

Vanselow v. MBS Trucking, Corp et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Vanselow filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MBS Trucking, Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard F. Sachs and Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Howard F. Sachs

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aleczander Vanselow

Defendants

Bogy's Enterprise

MBS Trucking, Inc.

Boyan S. Denkov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Legacie Van Erem

Attorney at Edelman & Thompson

3100 Broadway, Ste. 1400

Kansas City, MO 64111

James Trivett Thompson

Attorney at Edelman & Thompson LLC

3100 Broadway, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

Lee M. Baty

Attorney at Baty, Holm, Numrich & Otto - KCMO

4600 Madison Avenue, Suite 210

Kansas City, MO 64112-3019

Jared Gregory Brown

Attorney at Baty, Holm, Numrich & Otto - KCMO

4600 Madison Avenue, Suite 210

Kansas City, MO 64112-3019

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of appearance by Jared Gregory Brown on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise, Boyan S. Denkov, MBS Trucking, Inc. (Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party Bogy's Enterprise(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party Boyan S. Denkov(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party MBS Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brown, Jared) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of appearance by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise, Boyan S. Denkov, MBS Trucking, Inc. (Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please make note of the new case number 19-00375-CV-W-SRB. Signed on 6/5/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#10

(#10) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/19/2019. Signed on 6/4/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise.(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Boyan S. Denkov.(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all defendants. Answers shall be filed on or before June 7, 2019. Signed on 5/22/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baty, Lee) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, case number 1916-CV02396, filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of MBS Trucking, Corp. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6309001. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of appearance by Jared Gregory Brown on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise, Boyan S. Denkov, MBS Trucking, Inc. (Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party Bogy's Enterprise(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party Boyan S. Denkov(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Gregory Brown added to party MBS Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brown, Jared) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of appearance by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise, Boyan S. Denkov, MBS Trucking, Inc. (Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 6/11/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please make note of the new case number 19-00375-CV-W-SRB. Signed on 6/5/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/19/2019. Signed on 6/4/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Bogy's Enterprise.(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Boyan S. Denkov.(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of MBS Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all defendants. Answers shall be filed on or before June 7, 2019. Signed on 5/22/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baty, Lee) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, case number 1916-CV02396, filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of MBS Trucking, Corp. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6309001. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee M. Baty