This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:26:29 (UTC).

Vann v. Genovese

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Vann filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Genovese. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01059

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bruce M. Vann

Only, TN 37140

Respondent

Warden Kevin Genovese

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

John H. Bledsoe

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202

Thomas Austin Watkins

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P.O. Box 20207, War Memorial Building, 301 6Th Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37243

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Response to Motion RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS UNTIMELY HABEAS CORPUS PETITION filed by Kevin Genovese. (Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION TO EXCUSE FILING OF COMPLETE STATE COURT RECORD. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/6/19. (mbm) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

13 #2

envelope

13 #1

Exhibits A-G

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bruce M. Vann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Excuse Filing of Complete State Court Record-Proposed Order Submitted by Kevin Genovese. (Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

11 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Untimely Habeas Corpus Petitio

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Untimely Habeas Corpus Petition by Kevin Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Untimely Habeas Corpus Petition)(Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

10 #9

Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Permission to Appeal in Post-Co

10 #8

Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appea

10 #7

Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal

10 #6

Exhibit Technical Record on Post-Conviction Appeal

10 #5

Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Motion for Extension of Time to

10 #4

Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal

10 #3

Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal

10 #2

Exhibit Transcript of Sentencing Hearing on Direct appeal

10 #1

Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal

#10

(#10) INDEX OF STATE COURT RECORD by Kevin Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Sentencing Hearing on Direct appeal, #3 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #5 Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Permission to Appeal on Direct Appeal, #6 Exhibit Technical Record on Post-Conviction Appeal, #7 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #8 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #9 Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Permission to Appeal in Post-Conviction Appeal)(Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Response to Motion RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS UNTIMELY HABEAS CORPUS PETITION filed by Kevin Genovese. (Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION TO EXCUSE FILING OF COMPLETE STATE COURT RECORD. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/6/19. (mbm) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bruce M. Vann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Excuse Filing of Complete State Court Record-Proposed Order Submitted by Kevin Genovese. (Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Untimely Habeas Corpus Petition by Kevin Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Untimely Habeas Corpus Petition)(Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INDEX OF STATE COURT RECORD by Kevin Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Sentencing Hearing on Direct appeal, #3 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #5 Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Permission to Appeal on Direct Appeal, #6 Exhibit Technical Record on Post-Conviction Appeal, #7 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #8 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #9 Exhibit Order of Tennessee Supreme Court Denying Permission to Appeal in Post-Conviction Appeal)(Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of certified mail return receipt card to Office of the Attorney General re: DE# 6. (mbm) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Bledsoe on behalf of Kevin Genovese (Bledsoe, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of certified mail return receipt card to Respondent re: DE#6 . (mbm) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO RESPOND TO PETITION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/23/19. (mbm) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • (#5) Case initiation fee: $ 5.00, received on today's date, receipt number J4676007650. (skc) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Austin Watkins on behalf of Kevin Genovese (Watkins, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/27/19. (mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE 2254 HABEAS CORPUS against Kevin Genovese, filed by Bruce M. Vann. (Attachments: #1 Crim. Appeals Opinion, #2 Madison Co. Circuit Order, #3 envelope, #4 judge's card)(mbm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.