This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2022 at 20:00:06 (UTC).

VANLOAN v. THE NATION OF ISLAM et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 VANLOAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE NATION OF ISLAM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06112

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Defendants

DAVID VALENTIN

VICTOR MOYAO

MICHELLE MONREAL

LETICIA CAUBLE

LUIS GARCIA

GUSTAVO RIVERA

SAMUEL RIVERA

TONY MUHAMMED

SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

VINCENT GALAZ

THE NATION OF ISLAM

CLAUDIA AUDELO

MARY RODRIGUEZ

MARK PEREZ

BENITA ESPARZA

PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, INC.

EDGAR PEREZ

LYSETTE MURILLO

CAROLINE CONTRERAS

JOSE SOLORIO

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD C. SOKORAI

Attorney at HIGH SWARTZ ROBERTS & SEIDEL LLP

40 East Airy Street

Norristown, PA 19401

DAVID PAUL PRUETT

Attorney at CARROLL KELLY TROTTER & FRANZEN

111 W Ocean Blvd, Pobox 22636

Long Beach, CA 90801

SOL H. WEISS

Attorney at ANAPOL WEISS

One Logan Square, 130 N 18Th St Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

JOSE MONTOYA

Attorney at CITY OF SANTA ANA

20 Civic Center Plaza

Santa Ana, CA 92701

KYLE C. NELLESEN

Attorney at CITY OF SANTA ANA

2O Civic Center Plaza

Santa Ana, CA 92701

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) E-Mail Correspondence dated 9/28/21, re: Appeal Fee Paid, by JONATHAN VANLOAN (va, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#77

(#77) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #76 Notice of Appeal filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. USCA Case Number 21-2699. (va, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

76 #1

Email attachment

76 #76

Main Document

#75

(#75) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE NATION OF ISLAM, LOUIS FARRAKHAN, TONY MUHAMMED, JUAN VILLEGAS, THE SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, INC., AND DOE DEFENDANTS. THERE BEING NO NON-DISMISSED DEFENDANTS REMAINING IN THE CASE, THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE THE CASE AND MARK IT CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/17/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

42 #5

Exhibit Exh 5: CA DC Complaint of VanLoan

42 #3

Exhibit Exh 3: 9th Cir Decision Affirming AZ Dismissal

42 #2

Exhibit Exh 2: AZ DC Order Dismissal

41 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

4 #4

Email

4 #1

Filed Complaint Edited

3 #3

Email

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Exhibit

3 #3

Main Document

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) E-Mail Correspondence dated 9/28/21, re: Appeal Fee Paid, by JONATHAN VANLOAN (va, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number APAEDC15435985 re #76 Notice of Appeal filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. (va, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #76 Notice of Appeal filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. USCA Case Number 21-2699. (va, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Notice of Appeal filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and counsel. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Email attachment)(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder #75 mailed to unreps. (fdc) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrders 73, 74, and 75 mailed to unreps. (fdc) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE NATION OF ISLAM, LOUIS FARRAKHAN, TONY MUHAMMED, JUAN VILLEGAS, THE SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, INC., AND DOE DEFENDANTS. THERE BEING NO NON-DISMISSED DEFENDANTS REMAINING IN THE CASE, THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TERMINATE THE CASE AND MARK IT CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/17/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER THAT THE CITY OF SANTA DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #31 ) IS GRANTED; THE PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #41 ) IS GRANTED; THE PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (ECF NO. #42 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT; THE CITY OF FOUNTAIN VALLEY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO. #55 ) IS GRANTED; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS AS TERMINATED FROM THE CASE: THE CITY OF SANTA ANA, CALIFORNIA; CLAUDIA AUDELO; PHILLIP BACERRA; RUBEN CAMPOS; LETICIA CAUBLE; VANESSA CLARKSON; CAROLINE CONTRERAS; ENRIQUE ESPARZA; BENITA ESPARZA; VINCENT GALAZ; SANDRA GALLEGOS; DANIEL GARCIA; LUIS GARCIA; GIL ANDRES; KENNETH GOMINSKY; MARTHA GUILLEN; ANDREW HERRERA; FRANCISCO JUAREZ; PEDRO LUNA; IUPELI MANEAFAIGA; CODY MCCOY; MELINDA MENDOZA; LYSETTE MURILLO; MICHELLE MONREAL; VICTOR MOYAO; ERIC PAULSON; DAVID PENALOZA; EDGAR PEREZ; MARK PEREZ; OMAR PEREZ; MIGUEL PULIDO; MELANIE QUINGAIZA; CHELSEA RAMIREZ; DAVID REYES; GUSTAVO RIVERA; SAMUEL RIVERA; MARY RODRIGUEZ; VINCENT RODRIGUEZ; TERESA RUELAS; LAURA SANTOS; VICENTE SARMIENTO; NORMAN SBABO; CLAUDIA SMITH; JOSE SOLORIO; SUSAN THOMAS-REED; MARGO TODD; DAVID VALENTIN; ERNEST VILLEGAS; MANUEL VERDIN; JASON VIRAMONTES; RICK ZAVALA; THE CITY OF FOUNTAIN VALLEY, CA; KEVIN CHILDE; RICARDO CENDEJAS; SHERWIN BURGOS; PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, INC.; JAMES PIEROG, M.D.; RODNEY F. HOCHMAN, M.D.; AND AMY COMPTON-PHILLIPS, M.D.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/16/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/16/21. 8/17/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JONATHAN VANLOAN (VANLOAN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE Re: Service on Santa Ana Defendants, by JONATHAN VANLOAN (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Email)(va, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter to Chambers, re: Request for Extension of Time to Effect Service, etc., dated 2/18/21 by JONATHAN VANLOAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service, #2 Summons, #3 Waiver I, #4 Waiver II, #5 Email) (va, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF LAWSUIT & REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF SUMMONS, by JONATHAN VANLOAN. Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 CITY OF SANTA ANA SERVICE LIST, #2 Summons, #3 Edited Complaint, #4 Waiver of Service I, #5 Waiver of Service II, #6 Emailed) (va, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES CIVIL RIGHTS: 42 U.S.C. 1983 COMMON LAW TORTS, JURY DEMAND, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, against All Defendants., filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. (Attachments: #1 Filed Complaint Edited, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Email)(va, ) (FILED IN ERROR, AS PER #23 EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE.) (va, ). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email) (va, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE221862 (dmc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to GIL ANDRES, CLAUDIA AUDELO, PHILLIP BACERRA, SHERWIN BURGOS, RUBEN CAMPOS, LETICIA CAUBLE, RICARDO CENDEJAS, KEVIN CHILDE, VANESSA CLARKSON, AMY COMPTON-PHILLIPS, MD, CAROLINE CONTRERAS, BENITA ESPARAZA, ENRIQUE ESPARAZA, LOUIS FARRAKHAN, VINCENT GALAZ, SANDRA GALLEGOS, DANIEL GARCIA, LUIS GARCIA, KENNETH GOMINSKY, MARTHA GUILLEN, ANDREW HERRA, RODNEY F. HOCHMAN, MD, FRANCISCO JUAREZ, PEDRO LUNA, IUPELI MANEAFAIGA, VICTOR MAYAO, CODY MCCOY, MELINDA MENDOZA, MICHELLE MONREAL, TONY MUHAMMED, LYSETTE MURILLO, ERIC PAULSON, DAVID PENALOZA, EDGAR PEREZ, MARK PEREZ, OMAR PEREZ, JAMES PIEROG, MD, PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, INC., MIGUEL PULIDO, MELANIE QUINGAIZA, CHELSEA RAMIREZ, DAVID REYES, GUSTAVO RIVERA, SAMUEL RIVERA, MARY RODRIGUEZ, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, TERESA RUELAS, SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, INC., LAURA SANTOS, VICENTE SARMIENTO, NORMAN SBABO, CLAUDIA SMITH, JOSE SOLORIO, THE CITY OF FOUNTAIN VALLEY, CA, THE CITY OF SANTA ANA, CALIFORNIA, THE NATION OF ISLAM, SUSAN THOMAS-REED, MARGO TODD, DAVID VALENTIN, MANUEL VERDIN, ERNEST VILLEGAS, JUAN VILLEGAS, JASON VIRAMONTES, RICK ZAVALA. E-MAILED To: PRO SE on 12/4/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JONATHAN VANLOAN. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against "DOE DEFENDANTS 1-50", GIL ANDRES, CLAUDIA AUDELO, PHILLIP BACERRA, SHERWIN BURGOS, RUBEN CAMPOS, LETICIA CAUBLE, RICARDO CENDEJAS, KEVIN CHILDE, VANESSA CLARKSON, AMY COMPTON-PHILLIPS, MD, CAROLINE CONTRERAS, BENITA ESPARZA, ENRIQUE ESPARZA, LOUIS FARRAKHAN, VINCENT GALAZ, SANDRA GALLEGOS, DANIEL GARCIA, LUIS GARCIA, KENNETH GOMINSKY, MARTHA GUILLEN, ANDREW HERRERA, RODNEY F. HOCHMAN, MD, FRANCISCO JUAREZ, PEDRO LUNA, IUPELI MANEAFAIGA, VICTOR MOYAO, CODY MCCOY, MELINDA MENDOZA, MICHELLE MONREAL, TONY MUHAMMED, LYSETTE MURILLO, ERIC PAULSON, DAVID PENALOZA, EDGAR PEREZ, MARK PEREZ, OMAR PEREZ, JAMES PIEROG, MD, PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, INC., MIGUEL PULIDO, MELANIE QUINGAIZA, CHELSEA RAMIREZ, DAVID REYES, GUSTAVO RIVERA, SAMUEL RIVERA, MARY RODRIGUEZ, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, TERESA RUELAS, SANTA ANA POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, INC., LAURA SANTOS, VICENTE SARMIENTO, NORMAN SBABO, CLAUDIA SMITH, JOSE SOLORIO, THE CITY OF FOUNTAIN VALLEY, CA, THE CITY OF SANTA ANA, CALIFORNIA, THE NATION OF ISLAM, SUSAN THOMAS-REED, MARGO TODD, DAVID VALENTIN, MANUEL VERDIN, ERNEST VILLEGAS, JUAN VILLEGAS, JASON VIRAMONTES, RICK ZAVALA (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by JONATHAN VANLOAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, ) Modified on 12/4/2020 (md, ). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Ana Police Officers Associaton is a litigant

Latest cases where Nation of Islam is a litigant

Latest cases where Providence Health & Services is a litigant