This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 07:22:31 (UTC).

VANGAASBEEK et al v. BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 VANGAASBEEK filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDY VANGAASBEEK

MICHAEL VANGAASBEEK

Defendants

BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC

FOLEY CELLULOSE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEVIN CHARLES KOSTELNIK

Attorney at CRUZ LAW FIRM PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

411 N Calhoun Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TIFFANY ROUSSEAU CRUZ

Attorney at CRUZ LAW FIRM PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

411 N Calhoun Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

SARAH JEAN KUEHNEL

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS - ST LOUIS MO

7700 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 650

St Louis, MO 63105

KAREN ELIZABETH SMEDA

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH ETC PC - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602

CHRISTINA M FLORES

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP - CHICAGO IL

One North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

KRISTINA LYNN MARSH

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP - TAMPA FL

100 Ashley Drive S, Suite 1290

Tampa, FL 33602

MEGAN M MITCHELL

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP - HOUSTON TX

1900 West Loop South, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) RESPONSE by BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC re #22 Notice (Other) Defendant Brace's Response to Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report. (MITCHELL, MEGAN) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE by FOLEY CELLULOSE LLC re #22 Notice (Other) Defendant Foley Cellulose LLC's Response to Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report. (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report by BRANDY VANGAASBEEK, MICHAEL VANGAASBEEK (KOSTELNIK, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 03/10/2022. (rcb) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/9/22. Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/19/2022. Mediation Report due by 8/26/2022. The trial is removed from the docket and will be reset at a later date. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

18 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

18 #18

Main Document

#16

(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN ELIZABETH SMEDA on behalf of GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC from Third Judicial Circuit, Taylor County, FL, case number 2021-CA-000644. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6644846.), filed by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE by BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC re #22 Notice (Other) Defendant Brace's Response to Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report. (MITCHELL, MEGAN) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE by FOLEY CELLULOSE LLC re #22 Notice (Other) Defendant Foley Cellulose LLC's Response to Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report. (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Adverse Action Report by BRANDY VANGAASBEEK, MICHAEL VANGAASBEEK (KOSTELNIK, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #18 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 03/10/2022. (rcb) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/9/22. Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/19/2022. Mediation Report due by 8/26/2022. The trial is removed from the docket and will be reset at a later date. Case referred to mediation. (tss) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/9/2022 - written order to follow (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghan Mitchell( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6790813.) - Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (tss) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghan Mitchell.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6790813.) by BRACE INTEGRATED SERVICES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (MARSH, KRISTINA) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 10:00 AM EST before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BRANDY VANGAASBEEK, MICHAEL VANGAASBEEK. (KOSTELNIK, KEVIN) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #8 NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/14/2022. (atm) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CONFLICT WITH NOVEMBER 2, 2022 TRIAL TERM by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC re #7 Scheduling Order, (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/2/22. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/16/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 7/21/2022. Trial set for 11/2/2022 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING PROPER PARTIES signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/2/22. Deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/16/2022). (tss) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koch Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Georgia-Pacific Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate GPPC Equity Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Koch Renewable Resources LLC, Other Affiliate Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate GP Packaging and Cellulose Operations Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate GP Cellulose, LLC, Other Affiliate Foley Cellulose LLL for GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC.. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN ELIZABETH SMEDA on behalf of GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (SMEDA, KAREN) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC from Third Judicial Circuit, Taylor County, FL, case number 2021-CA-000644. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6644846.), filed by GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (KUEHNEL, SARAH) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOLEY CELLULOSE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Brace Integrated Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan McGregor Mitchell