This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:29 (UTC).

Vanessa Paola Cabello v. Johnson and Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Vanessa Paola Cabello against Johnson and Johnson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17165

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vanessa Paola Cabello

Defendants

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

12 #1

*Restricted*

#12

(#12) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-06696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#11

(#11) Conditional Transfer Order - 158 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2738, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

10 #1

Memorandum in Support of Moton to Stay All Proceedings

10 #2

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Moton to Stay All Proceedings, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), ; Jury Demand filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc..(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (sr) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Wendy R Fleishman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV22586 Receipt No: 0973-24190374 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

1 #1

Declaration of Emily Weissenberger in Support of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-06696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Conditional Transfer Order - 158 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2738, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Moton to Stay All Proceedings, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay) (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), ; Jury Demand filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc..(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (sr) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Wendy R Fleishman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Vanessa Paola Cabello. Filed in State Court on 6/28/19 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV22586 Receipt No: 0973-24190374 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily Weissenberger in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily M Weissenberger added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(Weissenberger, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.