This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2019 at 08:12:43 (UTC).

Vandenoever et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Vandenoever filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01374

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jill Vandenoever

David Vandenoever

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

John F Mayer

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Joshua Greatsinger

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Steven L Miracle

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols SC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - 19Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202-6622

Mark D Malloy

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols SC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - 19Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202-6622

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Malloy, Mark)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of David Vandenoever, Jill Vandenoever. Attorney(s) appearing: John F. Mayer (Mayer, John)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 9/23/2019. (Graff, Ryan)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Malloy on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark D. Malloy, Steven L. Miracle (Malloy, Mark)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Greatsinger, Joshua)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Greatsinger on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua M. Greatsinger (Greatsinger, Joshua)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by David Vandenoever, Jill Vandenoever. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3223635) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John F Mayer on behalf of David Vandenoever, Jill Vandenoever. Attorney(s) appearing: John F. Mayer (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 9/23/2019. (Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Malloy on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark D. Malloy, Steven L. Miracle (Malloy, Mark)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Greatsinger on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua M. Greatsinger (Greatsinger, Joshua)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by David Vandenoever, Jill Vandenoever. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3223635) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Greatsinger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan R Graff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Mayer