This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2020 at 08:37:57 (UTC).

VanDenBloom et al v. Arlone Township

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 VanDenBloom filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arlone Township. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00718

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bruce VanDenBoom

Linda VanDenBoom

Defendant

Arlone Township

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew E Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Law Group PLLC

768 Idaho Ave W

St. Paul, MN 55117

Defendant Attorney

Robert A Alsop

Attorney at Kennedy & Graven, Chartered

200 S 6Th St. Ste 470

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2021. Motions (disp) due by 2/28/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/22/2020.(JLB) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT OF CASE as to Arlone Township. (Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Arlone Township. Jointly Signed by Bruce VanDenBoom and Linda VanDenBoom.(Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Arlone Township (Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pine County District Court, case number 58-CV-20-92 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7558998) filed by Arlone Township. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alsop, Robert) Modified text on 3/12/2020 (MKB). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2021. Motions (disp) due by 2/28/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/22/2020.(JLB) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT OF CASE as to Arlone Township. (Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Arlone Township. Jointly Signed by Bruce VanDenBoom and Linda VanDenBoom.(Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Arlone Township (Alsop, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joshua P. Devaney as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) cc: Devaney. Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MKB). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Steven Anderson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) cc: Anderson. Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MKB). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-718 (WMW/LIB). (MKB) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pine County District Court, case number 58-CV-20-92 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7558998) filed by Arlone Township. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alsop, Robert) Modified text on 3/12/2020 (MKB). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less