This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 07:48:00 (UTC).

Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Centers for Medicare Medicaid Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew James Maddox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00977

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew James Maddox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendants

Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services

Chiquita Brooks-LaSure

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael B. Kimberly

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

500 North Capitol Street, Nw, The Mcdermott Building

Washington, DC 20001

Paul Whitfield Hughes

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

500 North Capitol Street, Nw, The Mcdermott Building

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew Ambrose Lyons-Berg

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorney

Roann Nichols

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

36 S Charles St Fourth Fl

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER granting in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the Complaint and to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 6/14/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.(Nichols, Roann) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

17 #1

Memorandum in Support

17 #17

Main Document

1 #14

Exhibit K-NORD Comments

1 #13

Exhibit J-National Multiple Sclerosis Society Comments

1 #12

Exhibit I-National Health Council Comments

1 #11

Exhibit H-NAMI Comments

1 #9

Exhibit F-Lupus Foundation Comments

1 #8

Exhibit E-HIV + Hep Comments

1 #6

Exhibit C-Purdue Comments

1 #4

Exhibit A-AstraZeneca Comments

1 #3

Summons Brooks-LaSure

1 #2

Summons CMS

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the Complaint and to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 6/14/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.(Nichols, Roann) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Roann) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. All Defendants.(Kimberly, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 5/20/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Roann Nichols on behalf of All Defendants (Nichols, Roann) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. All Defendants.(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued 60 days as to Chiquita Brooks-LaSure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Kimberly, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Limited, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Germany GmbH, Other Affiliate Vanda Pharmaceuticals Netherlands B.V. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, proposed summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Att'y)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. or counsel for Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/6/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 4/22/2022. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Corporate parents an/or affiliates must be added when the disclosure is filed. Please refile and add them on behalf of the party. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint,, filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendants. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendant using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses for the U.S. Attorney and Attorney General to be served in addition to the named defendant to #1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hughes, Paul) Modified on 4/22/2022 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9889629.), filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CMS, #3 Summons Brooks-LaSure, #4 Exhibit A-AstraZeneca Comments, #5 Exhibit B-Biogen Comments, #6 Exhibit C-Purdue Comments, #7 Exhibit D-ViiV Healthcare Comments, #8 Exhibit E-HIV + Hep Comments, #9 Exhibit F-Lupus Foundation Comments, #10 Exhibit G-Mental Health America Comments, #11 Exhibit H-NAMI Comments, #12 Exhibit I-National Health Council Comments, #13 Exhibit J-National Multiple Sclerosis Society Comments, #14 Exhibit K-NORD Comments, #15 Exhibit L- National Psoriasis Foundation Comments)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roann Nichols