This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:04:11 (UTC).

VanCannon v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 VanCannon filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee P. Rudofsky and Patricia S. Harris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lee P. Rudofsky

Patricia S. Harris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcia VanCannon

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Bartels Wallace

Attorney at Bartels Sherman & Wallace PLLC

Post Office Box 1640

Jonesboro, AR 72403

Defendant Attorney

Stacey Elise McCord

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 7/26/2021. (jak) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 07/12/2021. (llg) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcia VanCannon. Social Security Administration served on 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 7/26/2021. (jak) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 07/12/2021. (llg) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Marcia VanCannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcia VanCannon. (jak) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey Elise McCord