This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:37:47 (UTC).

VAN VOORHEES v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 VAN VOORHEES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06719

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELOISE M. VAN VOORHEES

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian David Nettles

Attorney at Law Offices of Brian D. Nettles, Ltd.

1389 Galleria Dr., Ste. 200

Henderson, NV 89014

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Paul L. Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER, LLP

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

MDL Minute Order

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#6) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#8

(#8) Submission SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, filed by ELOISE VAN VOORHEES. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ELOISE VAN VOORHEES. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ELOISE VAN VOORHEES. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submission SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, filed by ELOISE VAN VOORHEES. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docket(#7) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 1:22-cv-132 on 2/4/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6717-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Montana, Cause No. 2:22-cv-1 on 2/4/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6718-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Nevada, Cause No. 2:22-cv-89 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6719-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Eastern District of New York, Cause No. 2:22-cv-452 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6720-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06717-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06720-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:22-cv-00089. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-188) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana. Signed MDL on 2/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6765810) by Eloise M. Van Voorhees. Proof of service due by 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Nettles, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant