This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 06:09:36 (UTC).

Van v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Van filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim, Hildy Bowbeer, Katherine M. Menendez and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02891

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John R. Tunheim

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judges

Hildy Bowbeer

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Tuyet Van

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederick J. Goetz

Attorney at Goetz & Eckland PA

615 1St Avenue Ne, Suite 425

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Defendant Attorney

James S Alexander

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Lynn Tuyet Van. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James S Alexander on behalf of United States of America. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2891 (WMW/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 11/21/2019. (MKB) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Tuyet Van. United States of America served on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to The Court of Related Cases by Lynn Tuyet Van (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MMP) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7267869) filed by Lynn Tuyet Van. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (Text-Only) ORDER on #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Stipulation is GRANTED. United States of America answer due 3/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/9/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Lynn Tuyet Van. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James S Alexander on behalf of United States of America. (Alexander, James) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2891 (WMW/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 11/21/2019. (MKB) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Tuyet Van. United States of America served on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to The Court of Related Cases by Lynn Tuyet Van (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MMP) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd & 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2891 (JRT/HB). (MMP) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7267869) filed by Lynn Tuyet Van. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less