This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 07:41:51 (UTC).

Michael Van Ness v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Michael Van Ness filed an Other lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07153

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Van Ness

Defendants

ZF-TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.,

TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC

KIA Motors America

Hyundai Motor America

Fiat Chrysler US LLC (FCA US LLC)

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC

Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.

American Honda Motor Co.

Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A.

ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lesley E Weaver

Attorney at Bleichmar Fonti and Auld LLP

555 12Th Street Suite 1600

Oakland, CA 94607

Anne Kathleen Davis

Attorney at Bleichmar Fonti and Auld LLP

555 12Th Street Suite 1600

Oakland, CA 94607

Ex Kano S Sams, II

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joshua David Samra

Attorney at Bleichmar Fonti and Auld LLP

555 12Th Street Suite 1600

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-ml-02905 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07153 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth S Metcalf. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co., FCA US LLC, Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24277242 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Attorney Lesley E Weaver added to party Michael Van Ness(pty:pla))(Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter Safirstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court orders this case to be transferred to MDL No. 2905: In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Counsel shall refrain from filing any further pleadings or documents in this case as of the date of this Order. All documents shall be filed in MDL No. 2905. Counsel shall refer to the docket of MDL. No. 2905 to obtain the Order with respect to how all documents are to be filed. The Clerk is directed to close this case and transfer the names of all parties and their respective counsel to MDL No. 2905. (cbr) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness, (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court orders this case to be transferred to MDL No. 2905: In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Counsel shall refrain from filing any further pleadings or documents in this case as of the date of this Order. All documents shall be filed in MDL No. 2905. Counsel shall refer to the docket of MDL. No. 2905 to obtain the Order with respect to how all documents are to be filed. The Clerk is directed to close this case and transfer the names of all parties and their respective counsel to MDL No. 2905. (cbr) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-ml-02905 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07153 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth S Metcalf. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter Safirstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co., FCA US LLC, Hyundai Motor America, KIA Motors America, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness, (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24277242 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Van Ness. (Attorney Lesley E Weaver added to party Michael Van Ness(pty:pla))(Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.