This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 08:31:23 (UTC).

Van Hoomissen v. Yunji Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Van Hoomissen filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Yunji Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06479

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Van Hoomissen

Defendants

Wei Ying

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Yunji Inc.

Huan Hao

Qingrong Kong

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Top Capital Partners Limited

Shanglue Xiao

Yanhua Sun

Chen Chen

China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Charles Griffin

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert Alexander Fumerton

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

PSLRA Certification

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chen Chen, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Huan Hao, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Qingrong Kong, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Yanhua Sun, Top Capital Partners Limited, Shanglue Xiao, Wei Ying, Yunji Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12070379 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Van Hoomissen. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yunji Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#9

(#9) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #9 . The Initial Status Conference is adjourned, and defendant Yunji, Inc.'s time to answer extended, sine die, and will be reset after appointment of a lead plaintiff and consolidation of the related actions. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/3/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yunji Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fumerton, Robert) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chen Chen, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Huan Hao, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Qingrong Kong, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Yanhua Sun, Top Capital Partners Limited, Shanglue Xiao, Wei Ying, Yunji Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12070379 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Van Hoomissen. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.