This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 08:02:24 (UTC).

Van Hoeven v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Van Hoeven filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02527

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Van Hoeven

Defendant

Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Streetsuite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Larry E. Bache, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd.Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Rachel Seifert

1700 Lincoln Streetsuite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Michael Joseph Kaufmann

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Streetsuite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Streetsuite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Hannah Seifert McCalla

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Streetsuite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Hannah Seifert McCalla (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

16 #1

Docket

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Request for Jury Demand by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#13

(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 27 September 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #12 ) is GRANTED finding good cause shown. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #4 ) on or before October 1, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#14

(#14) STATE COURT ORDER Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff'sComplaint. By District Court Judge David John Stevens on 9/10/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #4

Main Document

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

State Court - Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

State Court - District Court Civil Summons

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Hannah Seifert McCalla (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Request for Jury Demand by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 27 September 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #12 ) is GRANTED finding good cause shown. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #4 ) on or before October 1, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATE COURT ORDER Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff'sComplaint. By District Court Judge David John Stevens on 9/10/2021 (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 September 2021. Consent Form due by 11/29/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/8/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Angela Van HoevenAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Angela Van Hoeven(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Angela Van HoevenAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Angela Van Hoeven(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Rachel Seifert on behalf of Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Hannah Rachel Seifert added to party Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company for Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Kaufmann, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Delay Reduction Order upon Cole Stender on 8/20/21 (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Angela Van Hoeven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(norlin, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter Text Only Entry. (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2021cv30580. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8079341), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Fact of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 State Court - District Court Civil Summons, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Affidavit of Service - Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, #8 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Andrew Moseley