This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:30:39 (UTC).

Vallo v. Budai et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Vallo filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Budai. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01566

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Princeton S Vallo

Minden, LA 71055

Defendants

Gary Sexton

Deputy Harper

Deputy Lee

F Dean Heard

Andy Budai

Sgt Barton

Captain Culpepper

Angela Lilly

Deputy Briskett

Sgt Wells

Deputy Martinez

John Lewis

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/9/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

3 #1

IFP application

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Princeton S Vallo. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #3 Proposed order) (Haik, K). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint to cure the deficiencies outlined in the order. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment and notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/26/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

4 #3

Proposed order

1 #2

Exhibits

#2

(#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/20/2019. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Barton, Briskett, Andy Budai, Culpepper, Harper, F Dean Heard, Lee, John Lewis, Angela Lilly, Martinez, Gary Sexton and Wells filed by Princeton S Vallo. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint to cure the deficiencies outlined in the order. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment and notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/26/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/20/2019. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Princeton S Vallo. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #3 Proposed order) (Haik, K). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/9/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Barton, Briskett, Andy Budai, Culpepper, Harper, F Dean Heard, Lee, John Lewis, Angela Lilly, Martinez, Gary Sexton and Wells filed by Princeton S Vallo. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope)(crt,Devillier, W) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.