This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 08:08:09 (UTC).

Valley View GN, LLC v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Valley View GN, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Arch Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00644

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Valley View GN, LLC d/b/a Valley View Apartments

Valley View GN, LLC doing business as Valley View Apartments

Defendants

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

National Fire and Marine Insurance Company

First Specialty Insurance Corporation

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

Landmark American Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Underwriters At Lloyd's London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Dale Green

Attorney at Green & Klein

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

William Truman Jones, Jr

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77022

Robert P Woodliff

Attorney at Robert P. Woodliff Attorney at Law

4144 North Central Expressway, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Diksa

Attorney at Tillman Batchelor LLP

5605 N. Macarthur Blvd, Suite 560

Irving, TX 75038

Mark D Tillman

Attorney at Tillman Batchelor LLP

5605 N Macarthur Blvd, Suite 560

Irving, TX 75038

G. Brian Odom

Attorney at Zelle LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

Lindsey P Bruning

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

901 Main St, Suite 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

Christopher Michael Raney

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scullt Mansukhani LLP

1900 West Loop S, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

Sona J Garcia

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 4100 West

Dallas, TX 75201-2708

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #8

Exhibit(s) F.- Texas Franchise Tax Public Information Report

1 #7

Exhibit(s) E.- Certificate of Formation for Valley View

1 #6

Exhibit(s) D.- Cert. of Interested Parties and Disclosures

1 #4

Exhibit(s) B.- State Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A.- Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The Court considered Defendant Arch Specialty Company's Motion to Substitute Counsel (ECF No. #10 ), filed June 22, 2021. The motion should be GRANTED. The Court orders that (i) Christopher M. Raney, Soa J. Garcia, and the firm Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP are substituted as counsel for Arch and (ii) G. Brian Odom, Lindsey P. Bruning, and the firm Zelle LLP are withdrawn as counsel for Arch. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/22/2021) (pef) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Christopher Michael Raney. Motion filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raney, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company (Diksa, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning April 11, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2021. Motions due by 12/13/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/13/2021. Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/8/2021) (pef) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint Scheduling Order) by First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Landmark American Insurance Company, National Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Odom, G.) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valley View GN, LLC. (Jones, William) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Truman Jones, Jr for Robert P. Woodliff on behalf of Valley View GN, LLC. (Jones, William) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Diksa, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before June 8, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/11/2021) (pef) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, National Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Underwriters At Lloyd's London identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Invesco Perpetual for Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (See doc #1 for image.) (sre) Modified on 5/13/2021 (sre). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) Modified on 5/13/2021 (sre). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company et al. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11881402) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) A.- Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit(s) B.- State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit(s) C.- State Court Filings, #6 Exhibit(s) D.- Cert. of Interested Parties and Disclosures, #7 Exhibit(s) E.- Certificate of Formation for Valley View, #8 Exhibit(s) F.- Texas Franchise Tax Public Information Report) (Odom, G.) Modified filers on 5/11/2021 (bdb). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Arch Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant