This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2021 at 09:53:24 (UTC).

Valley Mechanical, Inc. v. General Mills Operations, LLC (TV2)

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Valley Mechanical, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Mills Operations, LLC TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Valley Mechanical, Inc.

608 Salem Road

Rossville, GA 30741

Defendant and Counter Claimant

General Mills Operations, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lance W Pope

Attorney at Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway, PC

537 Market Street, Suite 202

Chattanooga, TN 37402-1225

Gary R Patrick

Attorney at Patrick, Beard, Schulman & Jacoway, PC

537 Market Street, Suite 202

Chattanooga, TN 37402-1225

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Adam Charles Sanders

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke P.A.

431 South Seventh Street, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Joe A Conner

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Chatt)

1900 Republic Centre, 633 Chestnut Street

Chattanooga, TN 37450

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Valley Mechanical, Inc..(Patrick, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY****Administrative Notice to Counsel #15 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent :PDF is interactive, please make sure to flatten all documents. (BDG) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Valley Mechanical, Inc. (Patrick, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Patrick, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS) Mailed to Benjamin W Hulse. (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Valley Mechanical, Inc. by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Sanders, Adam) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/3/21. (ABF) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 8/30/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/21/21. (ABF) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-15-21. (KMG) Modified on 4/19/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Benjamin W. Hulse. (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by General Mills Operations, LLC. (Sanders, Adam) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Benjamin W. Hulse ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707134.) filed by General Mills Operations, LLC (BJL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL) Modified on 4/9/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Benjamin W Hulse (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/9/2021. (BJL) Modified on 4/9/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Benjamin W Hulse (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/9/2021. (BJL) Modified on 4/9/2021 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Benjamin W Hulse (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/9/2021. (BJL) Modified on 4/9/2021 (BJL). *Mailed to Attorney Benjamin W Hulse (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Benjamin W. Hulse ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4707134.) by General Mills Operations, LLC. (Sanders, Adam) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Mills Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Mills Cereals Manager, Inc. for General Mills Operations, LLC. (Sanders, Adam) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Hamilton County, case number 21C261. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4705777), filed by General Mills Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Cost Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Summons Return, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Filing, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Adam) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL MILLS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance W Pope

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary R Patrick