This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:43:11 (UTC).

Valley Forge Insurance Company et al v. Washington Square Hotel Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Valley Forge Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Washington Square Hotel Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Continental Casualty Company

Valley Forge Insurance Company

Defendants

Washington Square Hotel Holdings, LLC

Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Herbert Matthew Munson

Attorney at BETTS PATTERSON & MINES (SEA)

701 Pike St, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98101-3927

Lawrence Gottlieb

Attorney at BETTS PATTERSON & MINES (SEA)

701 Pike St, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98101-3927

Defendant Attorneys

Elliot C Copenhaver

Attorney at CARNEY BADLEY SPELLMAN PS

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

Jason M Kettrick

Attorney at CARNEY BADLEY SPELLMAN PS

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

Jeffrey David Laveson

Attorney at CARNEY BADLEY SPELLMAN PS

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 3600

Seattle, WA 98104-7010

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/31/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/14/2021. (AD) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Elliot C Copenhaver on behalf of Defendant Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC. (Copenhaver, Elliot) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason M Kettrick on behalf of Defendant Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC. (Kettrick, Jason) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company (Munson, Herbert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Washington Square Hotel Holdings, LLC, filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Munson, Herbert) (Fee Paid: AWAWDC-7137788) Modified to update fee status and receipt number on 6/23/2021 (STP). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Munson, Herbert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/31/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/14/2021. (AD) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Jeffrey David Laveson added for Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC; per #5 Notice of Attorney Association. (LH) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Elliot C Copenhaver on behalf of Defendant Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC. (Copenhaver, Elliot) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason M Kettrick on behalf of Defendant Washington Square Hotel Holdings LLC. (Kettrick, Jason) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (RE) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company (Munson, Herbert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Washington Square Hotel Holdings, LLC, filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Munson, Herbert) (Fee Paid: AWAWDC-7137788) Modified to update fee status and receipt number on 6/23/2021 (STP). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Continental Casualty Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Munson, Herbert) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley Forge Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elliot C Copenhaver